NY A05062 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - approval memo.100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - approval memo.100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Gives schools improved access to the statewide immunization database.
Title
Gives schools improved access to the statewide immunization database.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Assembly | approval memo.100 |
2021-12-22 | Assembly | signed chap.733 |
2021-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-05-12 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-12 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.665 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4962 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.319 |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04962 (Same As) 2021-05-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5062