NY A05056 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-8)
Status: Passed on December 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-21 - approval memo.23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-8)
Status: Passed on December 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-21 - approval memo.23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes an enterprise approach to the detection and prevention of fraud, waste and abuse in state government and the detection and prevention of improper payments of public moneys.
Title
Authorizes an enterprise approach to the detection and prevention of fraud, waste and abuse in state government and the detection and prevention of improper payments of public moneys.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-21 | Senate | approval memo.23 |
2015-12-21 | Senate | signed chap.566 |
2015-12-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3757 |
2015-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.487 |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-02-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S03757 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5056