NY A05045 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - advanced to third reading cal.593
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - advanced to third reading cal.593
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the New York electronic communications privacy act relating to the search and seizure of electronic devices and electronic communications; prohibits law enforcement from compelling the production of or access to electronic device information from any person or entity other than the authorized possessor of the device without a warrant.
Title
Creates the New York electronic communications privacy act relating to the search and seizure of electronic devices and electronic communications; prohibits law enforcement from compelling the production of or access to electronic device information from any person or entity other than the authorized possessor of the device without a warrant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.593 |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | referred to codes |