NY A05045 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - print number 5045a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - print number 5045a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the provision of law that volunteer firefighters and ambulance workers who receive a real property tax exemption for service may not receive the income tax credit for such service; makes technical corrections.
Title
Repeals the provision of law that volunteer firefighters and ambulance workers who receive a real property tax exemption for service may not receive the income tax credit for such service; makes technical corrections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | print number 5045a |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03905 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - referred to ways and means