NY A05040 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - substituted by s2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - substituted by s2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits owners, lessors or agents thereof from assessing a lessee any fee for legal services in connection with any operation or rental of a residential unit unless the owner, lessor or agent has the legal authority to do so.
Title
Prohibits owners, lessors or agents thereof from assessing a lessee any fee for legal services in connection with any operation or rental of a residential unit unless the owner, lessor or agent has the legal authority to do so.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Assembly | substituted by s2014 |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.174 |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S02014 (Same As) 2021-12-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.79