NY A05039 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - ordered to third reading rules cal.107
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires stores to publicly display their return and refund policies, including tracking of returns; failure to display provides buyer with automatic refund or credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires stores to publicly display their return and refund policies, including tracking of returns; failure to display provides buyer with automatic refund or credit.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-09Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.107
2015-06-09Assemblyrules report cal.107
2015-06-09Assemblyreported
2015-06-02Assemblyreported referred to rules
2015-05-27Assemblyreported referred to codes
2015-02-10Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback