NY A05033 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts veterans eighty-five years of age and older from the obligation to pay New York state income tax.
Title
Exempts veterans eighty-five years of age and older from the obligation to pay New York state income tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05995 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE