NY A05031 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the information which must be included on applications for absentee ballots for school district elections.
Title
Relates to the information which must be included on applications for absentee ballots for school district elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2016-03-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-03-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.198 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-03-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2015-03-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-03-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.114 |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | reported |
2015-02-10 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S00847 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION