NY A05028 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Hearing: May 30 @ 10:00 am in Room 630 LOB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to returnable bottles; extends the effectiveness of the "Cleaner, Greener NY Act of 2013".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to returnable bottles; extends the effectiveness of the "Cleaner, Greener NY Act of 2013".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-03-07Assemblyprint number 5028a
2019-03-07Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation
2019-02-06Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S02129 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - PRINT NUMBER 2129A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback