NY A05028 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes standards for farm worker protection at any agricultural site where pesticides have been or will be applied; requires mandatory testing for pesticides; requires personal protective equipment to be provided to workers; provides education to workers and their families about the hazards of pesticides; requires additional on-site protective measures; requires the department of health to issue an annual report of all farm inspections on or before March first to the governor and legislature.
Title
Establishes standards for farm worker protection at any agricultural site where pesticides have been or will be applied; requires mandatory testing for pesticides; requires personal protective equipment to be provided to workers; provides education to workers and their families about the hazards of pesticides; requires additional on-site protective measures; requires the department of health to issue an annual report of all farm inspections on or before March first to the governor and legislature.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Englebright [D] | Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Michelle Schimel [D] |
Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-02-14 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05031 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH