NY A05028 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - signed chap.77
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - signed chap.77
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the date allowable for exemptions for first-time homebuyers of newly constructed homes to on or after December 31, 2016.
Title
Extends the date allowable for exemptions for first-time homebuyers of newly constructed homes to on or after December 31, 2016.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | Senate | signed chap.77 |
2011-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-05-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-05-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-05-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.162 |
2011-05-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3176 |
2011-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-05-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-05-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-05-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.259 |
2011-05-03 | Assembly | reported |
2011-04-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-02-10 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S03176 (Same As) 2011-05-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5028