NY A05025 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the domestic violence escalation prevention act including certain offenses against members of the same family or household within the definition of serious offense.
Title
Enacts the domestic violence escalation prevention act including certain offenses against members of the same family or household within the definition of serious offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-03-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.356 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | ruling of chair on point of order |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.161 |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |