NY A05020 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-10 - substituted by s1780a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-10 - substituted by s1780a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the FreshConnect program, which provides rebates for the purchase of local produce to certain people, to include local produce sold in supermarkets and grocery stores.
Title
Expands the FreshConnect program, which provides rebates for the purchase of local produce to certain people, to include local produce sold in supermarkets and grocery stores.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s1780a |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.813 |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | print number 5020a |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to agriculture |
2023-02-27 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S01780 (Same As) 2023-12-22 - VETOED MEMO.130