NY A05015 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits deregulation without verification of the tax abatement/credit status of a building; and requires local agencies to notify the state division of housing and community renewal of approval of an application for a tax exemption.
Title
Prohibits deregulation without verification of the tax abatement/credit status of a building; and requires local agencies to notify the state division of housing and community renewal of approval of an application for a tax exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-15 | Assembly | print number 5015b |
2018-06-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | print number 5015a |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to housing |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | referred to housing |