NY A05011 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-17 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a written determination to be made, on each application for issuance or renewal of a license to carry or possess a pistol or revolver, within 180 days of receipt; requires refund of all fees submitted with such application if a determination is not made in a timely manner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires a written determination to be made, on each application for issuance or renewal of a license to carry or possess a pistol or revolver, within 180 days of receipt; requires refund of all fees submitted with such application if a determination is not made in a timely manner.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-17Assemblyheld for consideration in codes
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-02-06Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S00931 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S04680 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback