NY A05006 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-17)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - print number 5006c
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - print number 5006c
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits members of the legislature from obtaining funding through state grants or member items and subsequently providing such funding to any business entities or not-for-profit entities in which such officials, members, domestic partners or certain relatives hold official or legal positions.
Title
Prohibits members of the legislature from obtaining funding through state grants or member items and subsequently providing such funding to any business entities or not-for-profit entities in which such officials, members, domestic partners or certain relatives hold official or legal positions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | Assembly | print number 5006c |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2016-03-09 | Assembly | print number 5006b |
2016-03-09 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2016-01-15 | Assembly | print number 5006a |
2016-01-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2015-02-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |