NY A05005 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides free fentanyl test strips to individuals at specified distribution facilities; requires a public awareness campaign on the dangers of fentanyl and the provision of the test strips.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides free fentanyl test strips to individuals at specified distribution facilities; requires a public awareness campaign on the dangers of fentanyl and the provision of the test strips.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2023-04-25Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2023-04-21Assemblyamend by restoring to original print 5005
2023-04-19Assemblyprint number 5005a
2023-04-19Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to alcoholism and drug abuse
2023-02-27Assemblyreferred to alcoholism and drug abuse

Same As/Similar To

S05671 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE USE DISORDERS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback