NY A05004 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-09 - substituted by s4393
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-09 - substituted by s4393
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that when informational cards or sheets about opioid antagonists are distributed, such information shall include information about fentanyl strips and their uses.
Title
Provides that when informational cards or sheets about opioid antagonists are distributed, such information shall include information about fentanyl strips and their uses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Assembly | substituted by s4393 |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.391 |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | reported |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2023-02-27 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
Same As/Similar To
S04393 (Same As) 2024-12-17 - SIGNED CHAP.600