NY A04992 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - held for consideration in transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - held for consideration in transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of motor vehicles to enter into an agreement with the Republic of China (Taiwan) for reciprocity of driver's licenses.
Title
Requires the commissioner of motor vehicles to enter into an agreement with the Republic of China (Taiwan) for reciprocity of driver's licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Assembly | held for consideration in transportation |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06649 (Same As) 2022-04-05 - PRINT NUMBER 6649A