NY A04985 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - held for consideration in election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows any qualified person to apply for voter registration and enrollment by application made with an application for any hunting or fishing license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows any qualified person to apply for voter registration and enrollment by application made with an application for any hunting or fishing license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-14Assemblyheld for consideration in election law
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to election law
2019-02-06Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S05303 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback