NY A04982 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 75-10)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a self-sufficient retirement savings program in the form of an automatic enrollment payroll deduction IRA, and establishes an administrative board responsible for promoting greater retirement savings for private sector employees in a convenient, low-cost, and transferable manner.
Title
Creates a self-sufficient retirement savings program in the form of an automatic enrollment payroll deduction IRA, and establishes an administrative board responsible for promoting greater retirement savings for private sector employees in a convenient, low-cost, and transferable manner.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | print number 4982b |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | print number 4982a |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04344 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE