NY A04981 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the deadline to February 10, 2021 for paying property taxes without interest or penalty in counties where a state disaster emergency was declared where the deadline for paying such taxes was February 1, 2021; provides for a refund to any person having paid interest or penalties between February 1, 2021 and February 10, 2021.
Title
Extends the deadline to February 10, 2021 for paying property taxes without interest or penalty in counties where a state disaster emergency was declared where the deadline for paying such taxes was February 1, 2021; provides for a refund to any person having paid interest or penalties between February 1, 2021 and February 10, 2021.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |