NY A04980 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-01 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-01 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires electric corporations to submit electric utility emergency plans to the public service commission for review and approval; provides such plans shall set forth training and planning for power outages, procedures to determine the extent of outages, procedures to determine the length of time the outages will continue, load relief policies, decision making plans, and any other information such commission requires; annually requires electric corporations file emergency plans and verification of the ability to implement such plan; requires electric corporations to report to the public service commission within 60 days of an outage which lasts more than 48 hours.
Title
Requires electric corporations to submit electric utility emergency plans to the public service commission for review and approval; provides such plans shall set forth training and planning for power outages, procedures to determine the extent of outages, procedures to determine the length of time the outages will continue, load relief policies, decision making plans, and any other information such commission requires; annually requires electric corporations file emergency plans and verification of the ability to implement such plan; requires electric corporations to report to the public service commission within 60 days of an outage which lasts more than 48 hours.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2011-03-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-03-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-02-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.61 |
2011-02-15 | Assembly | reported |
2011-02-09 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S01083 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
A01672 (Same As) 2011-02-09 - enacting clause stricken
A01672 (Same As) 2011-02-09 - enacting clause stricken