NY A04979 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-01 - substituted by s1209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-01 - substituted by s1209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the date of the public hearing to discuss the contents of the proposed budget of fire, fire alarm, and fire protection districts to be held during the third week of October.
Title
Authorizes the date of the public hearing to discuss the contents of the proposed budget of fire, fire alarm, and fire protection districts to be held during the third week of October.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | substituted by s1209 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.183 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S01209 (Same As) 2021-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.278