NY A04977 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination against religious attire and appurtenances thereto, including facial hair.
Title
Prohibits discrimination against religious attire and appurtenances thereto, including facial hair.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.355 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.29 |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.29 |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | reported |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01503 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS