NY A04959 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the moratorium on the issuance of certificates of environmental safety for the siting of facilities and certification of routes for the transportation of liquefied natural or petroleum gas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the moratorium on the issuance of certificates of environmental safety for the siting of facilities and certification of routes for the transportation of liquefied natural or petroleum gas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 112 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-27SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-27Senate3RD READING CAL.348
2019-03-27SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3855
2019-03-26SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2019-03-26Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-26Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-14Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.142
2019-03-12Assemblyreported
2019-02-06Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S03855 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4959

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback