NY A04956 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - signed chap.22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - signed chap.22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the expiration of the mortgage recording tax imposed by the city of Yonkers.
Title
Extends the expiration of the mortgage recording tax imposed by the city of Yonkers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 115 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 115 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | Senate | signed chap.22 |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3878 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | home rule request |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.200 |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | reported |
2015-02-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03878 (Same As) 2015-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4956