NY A04949 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - substituted by s5224b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for the election of members of the board of education of the Buffalo city school district in November rather than in May; creates a timetable for the electoral proceedings therefor; extends the terms of current members of such board to the last day of December rather than June; provides for future terms to run from January through December; and staggers terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the election of members of the board of education of the Buffalo city school district in November rather than in May; creates a timetable for the electoral proceedings therefor; extends the terms of current members of such board to the last day of December rather than June; provides for future terms to run from January through December; and staggers terms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s5224b
2019-06-18Assemblyamended on third reading 4949b
2019-06-18Assemblyvote reconsidered - restored to third reading
2019-06-18AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18Senaterecalled from senate
2019-06-13SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-13Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-13Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.131
2019-06-11Assemblyrules report cal.131
2019-06-11Assemblyreported
2019-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-05-31Assemblyprint number 4949a
2019-05-31Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to education
2019-02-06Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S05224 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04949&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04949&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04949
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04949&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04949A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04949&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04949B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04949&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04949&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04949&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback