NY A04937 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting police officers from carrying or using a firearm during any phase of the officer's official duties unless the officer has satisfactorily completed a course of training that meets or exceeds the minimum standards established by the municipal police training council.
Title
Relates to prohibiting police officers from carrying or using a firearm during any phase of the officer's official duties unless the officer has satisfactorily completed a course of training that meets or exceeds the minimum standards established by the municipal police training council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | print number 4937a |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S03518 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CODES