NY A04937 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - SIGNED CHAP.676
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - SIGNED CHAP.676
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the New York state energy research and development authority to study and make recommendations regarding the state's electric vehicle inventory and improvements to the state's electric vehicle infrastructure.
Title
Requires the New York state energy research and development authority to study and make recommendations regarding the state's electric vehicle inventory and improvements to the state's electric vehicle infrastructure.
Sponsors
Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. Robert Carroll [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] |
Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.676 |
2019-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.263 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a4937 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1401 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s5820 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.263 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.263 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S05820 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - SIGNED CHAP.676