NY A04935 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-04 - print number 4935b
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-04 - print number 4935b
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to tax lien foreclosure; establishes senior, disabled, and veteran homeowner real property tax assistance program; establishes installment plans for certain real property taxes.
Title
Relates to tax lien foreclosure; establishes senior, disabled, and veteran homeowner real property tax assistance program; establishes installment plans for certain real property taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Assembly | print number 4935b |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | print number 4935a |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2023-02-27 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05213 (Same As) 2024-06-03 - PRINT NUMBER 5213A