NY A04924 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Designates a portion of the state highway system constituting the bridge on state route 79, crossing over the Chenango River and connecting the town of Greene, county of Chenango, with the town of Fenton, county of Broome, as the "SP4 Herman Emil Anders, Jr. Memorial Bridge".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates a portion of the state highway system constituting the bridge on state route 79, crossing over the Chenango River and connecting the town of Greene, county of Chenango, with the town of Fenton, county of Broome, as the "SP4 Herman Emil Anders, Jr. Memorial Bridge".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-06SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-06-06Senate3RD READING CAL.462
2024-06-06SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5937B
2024-06-05SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2024-06-05Assemblydelivered to senate
2024-06-05Assemblypassed assembly
2024-06-05Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.436
2024-06-05Assemblyrules report cal.436
2024-06-05Assemblyreported
2024-05-28Assemblyreported referred to rules
2024-05-21Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2024-04-29Assemblyprint number 4924b
2024-04-29Assemblyamend and recommit to transportation
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to transportation
2023-06-08Assemblyprint number 4924a
2023-06-08Assemblyamend and recommit to transportation
2023-02-27Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S05937 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4924B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A4924
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04924&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04924
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04924&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04924A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04924&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04924B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04924&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04924&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04924&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A4924#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04924&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback