NY A04918 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-23 - signed chap.287
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Extends provisions relating to the mortgage tax in the county of Steuben until December 1, 2025.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends provisions relating to the mortgage tax in the county of Steuben until December 1, 2025.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 121 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-23Assemblysigned chap.287
2023-08-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2023-05-23SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-05-23SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-23SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2023-05-23Senate3RD READING CAL.917
2023-05-23SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5610A
2023-05-17SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2023-05-17Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-05-17Assemblypassed assembly
2023-05-17Assemblyhome rule request
2023-05-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.156
2023-05-17Assemblyrules report cal.156
2023-05-17Assemblyreported
2023-05-16Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-03-29Assemblyprint number 4918a
2023-03-29Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2023-02-24Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S05610 (Same As) 2023-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4918A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A4918
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04918&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04918
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04918&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04918A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04918&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04918&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04918&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A4918#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback