NY A04914 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates minority and women-owned business enterprise regional advocates; provides that the advocates will help ensure that municipal agencies comply with the provisions of law relating to minority and women-owned business enterprises.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates minority and women-owned business enterprise regional advocates; provides that the advocates will help ensure that municipal agencies comply with the provisions of law relating to minority and women-owned business enterprises.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-04Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-04Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.511
2019-05-30Assemblyreported
2019-02-27Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-02-05Assemblyreferred to small business

Same As/Similar To

S02195 (Same As) 2019-01-23 - REFERRED TO FINANCE

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback