NY A04914 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates minority and women-owned business enterprise regional advocates; provides that the advocates will help ensure that municipal agencies comply with the provisions of law relating to minority and women-owned business enterprises.
Title
Creates minority and women-owned business enterprise regional advocates; provides that the advocates will help ensure that municipal agencies comply with the provisions of law relating to minority and women-owned business enterprises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | committed to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.189 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.511 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to small business |
Same As/Similar To
S02195 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO FINANCE