NY A04914 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - print number 4914b
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - print number 4914b
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to improper practices relating to staff membership or professional privileges of a physician and such physician's board certification.
Title
Relates to improper practices relating to staff membership or professional privileges of a physician and such physician's board certification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Assembly | print number 4914b |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | print number 4914a |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07357 (Same As) 2018-05-03 - PRINT NUMBER 7357A