NY A04913 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - approval memo.61
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - approval memo.61
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to including the name of the individual or business enterprise that has been awarded an identical or substantially similar procurement contract in certain notices of procurement contract opportunities.
Title
Relates to including the name of the individual or business enterprise that has been awarded an identical or substantially similar procurement contract in certain notices of procurement contract opportunities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Assembly | approval memo.61 |
2021-12-10 | Assembly | signed chap.662 |
2021-11-29 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.301 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1878B |
2021-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.430 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.430 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | print number 4913a |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01878 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4913A