NY A04903 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - substituted by s993a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the office of addiction services and supports to assure that persons who suffer from a substance use disorder have the right to seek and receive addiction services, care, treatment and rehabilitation services based on the individual's gender identity, gender expression and/or sexual orientation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the office of addiction services and supports to assure that persons who suffer from a substance use disorder have the right to seek and receive addiction services, care, treatment and rehabilitation services based on the individual's gender identity, gender expression and/or sexual orientation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-21Assemblysubstituted by s993a
2023-05-24Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.231
2023-05-24Assemblyrules report cal.231
2023-05-24Assemblyreported
2023-05-16Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-02-24Assemblyreferred to alcoholism and drug abuse

Same As/Similar To

S00993 (Same As) 2023-06-25 - SIGNED CHAP.141

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback