NY A04903 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s3491a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s3491a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires disclosure by principal creditors and debt collection agencies of the legal obligations of a deceased debtor's family.
Title
Requires disclosure by principal creditors and debt collection agencies of the legal obligations of a deceased debtor's family.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s3491a |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.309 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | print number 4903a |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S03491 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.471