NY A04879 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to exculpatory material and requires for disclosure of such to the defense.
Title
Relates to exculpatory material and requires for disclosure of such to the defense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-04 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-02-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S03276 (Same As) 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES