NY A04863 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-09 - print number 4863b
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes counties to set interest rates imposed on late payment of property taxes and delinquencies and redemption of property subject to more than one tax lien.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes counties to set interest rates imposed on late payment of property taxes and delinquencies and redemption of property subject to more than one tax lien.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-09Assemblyprint number 4863b
2019-09-09Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to real property taxation
2019-08-21Assemblyprint number 4863a
2019-08-21Assemblyamend and recommit to real property taxation
2019-02-05Assemblyreferred to real property taxation

Same As/Similar To

S04676 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback