NY A04863 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the department of financial services, in consultation with the commissioner of health, to study and report upon insurance coverage for the treatment of Lyme disease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the department of financial services, in consultation with the commissioner of health, to study and report upon insurance coverage for the treatment of Lyme disease.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE
2018-03-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-03-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.344
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-06-13SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-13Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-13Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.217
2017-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.217
2017-06-13Assemblyreported
2017-06-08Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-06-06Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-06-02Assemblyprint number 4863a
2017-06-02Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to insurance
2017-02-03Assemblyreferred to insurance

Same As/Similar To

S02168 (Same As) 2018-03-26 - referred to insurance

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04863&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04863&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04863
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04863&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04863A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04863&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04863&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04863&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04863&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback