NY A04853 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-25)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - substituted by s5685
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts Brianna's Law; requires that operators of mechanically propelled vessels complete a boating safety course.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts Brianna's Law; requires that operators of mechanically propelled vessels complete a boating safety course.

Sponsors

Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Michael Miller [D]Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]
Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. David McDonough [R]Asm. Inez Dickens [D]
Asm. Andrew Raia [R]Asm. Michael Montesano [R]Asm. Joseph Giglio [R]Asm. Philip Ramos [D]
Asm. Jose Rivera [D]Asm. Michele Titus [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]
Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]Asm. Carrie Woerner [D]Asm. Peter Lawrence [R]
Asm. Edward Ra [R]Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Charles Barron [D]Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte [D]
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]
Asm. Kevin Byrne [R]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Melissa Miller [R]Asm. Andrew Garbarino [R]
Asm. Gary Pretlow [D]Asm. David DiPietro [R]Asm. Mark Johns [R]Asm. Didi Barrett [D]
Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. Mary Walsh [R]Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D]
Asm. Michael Cusick [D]Asm. Jaime Williams [D]Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]
Asm. Brian Miller [R]Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. David Buchwald [D]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]
Asm. Karl Brabenec [R]Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]Asm. Nick Perry [D]
Asm. Steve Stern [D]Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. Latrice Walker [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]
Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]Asm. Christopher Tague [R]Asm. Anthony Palumbo [R]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]
Asm. Doug Smith [R]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. Gary Finch [R]
Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]Asm. Stephen Hawley [R]Asm. Erik Dilan [D]Asm. Michael LiPetri [R]
Asm. Judy Griffin [D]Asm. Peter Abbate [D]Asm. Jacob Ashby [R]Asm. Kenneth Blankenbush [R]
Asm. Maritza Davila [D]Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]
Asm. Michael Fitzpatrick [R]Asm. Christopher Friend [R]Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. Philip Palmesano [R]Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]
Asm. Fred Thiele [D]

Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Assemblysubstituted by s5685
2019-05-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.509
2019-05-30Assemblyreported
2019-05-21Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-05-13Assemblyprint number 4853a
2019-05-13Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
2019-02-05Assemblyreferred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development

Same As/Similar To

S03399 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
S05685 (Same As) 2019-08-06 - SIGNED CHAP.147

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback