NY A04853 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-25)
Status: Passed on August 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-06 - SIGNED CHAP.147
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-25)
Status: Passed on August 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-06 - SIGNED CHAP.147
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts Brianna's Law; requires that operators of mechanically propelled vessels complete a boating safety course.
Title
Enacts Brianna's Law; requires that operators of mechanically propelled vessels complete a boating safety course.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.147 |
2019-07-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-04 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-04 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.509 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | substituted for a4853a |
2019-05-15 | Senate | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.686 |
2019-05-10 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | substituted by s5685 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.509 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | print number 4853a |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S03399 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
S05685 (Same As) 2019-08-06 - SIGNED CHAP.147
S05685 (Same As) 2019-08-06 - SIGNED CHAP.147