NY A04827 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that any bill which provides revenue to the state in a non-recurring manner shall pass by a two-thirds majority in order to become law.
Title
Requires that any bill which provides revenue to the state in a non-recurring manner shall pass by a two-thirds majority in order to become law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S01530 (Same As) 2022-03-01 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY