NY A04826 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits plea bargaining to any lesser offense when a defendant is charged or indicted for the crime of rape in the first degree.
Title
Prohibits plea bargaining to any lesser offense when a defendant is charged or indicted for the crime of rape in the first degree.
Sponsors
Asm. Peter Rivera [D] | Asm. Eric Stevenson [D] | Asm. Naomi Rivera [D] | Asm. Lou Tobacco [R] |
Asm. Robert Castelli [R] | Asm. Joseph Saladino [R] | Asm. Matthew Titone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-04 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-02-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S03159 (Same As) 2011-02-10 - REFERRED TO CODES