NY A04824 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - print number 4824a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - print number 4824a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to small business savings accounts; provides tax incentives for contributions and distributions.
Title
Relates to small business savings accounts; provides tax incentives for contributions and distributions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-21 | Assembly | print number 4824a |
2022-01-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S00702 (Same As) 2022-02-01 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE