NY A04824 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "New York state healthy kids act", to provide that only healthy foods and beverages be served, during the school day, in all schools in the state; directs the board of regents and the commissioner of education to establish nutritional standards therefor.
Title
Enacts the "New York state healthy kids act", to provide that only healthy foods and beverages be served, during the school day, in all schools in the state; directs the board of regents and the commissioner of education to establish nutritional standards therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-04 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to education |
2011-02-16 | Assembly | print number 4824a |
2011-02-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2011-02-08 | Assembly | referred to education |