NY A04817 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s329a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Family and Children's Association to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status with respect to the 2019-2020 assessment roll for a portion of the 2019-2020 school taxes and a portion of the 2019 general taxes and all of the 2020 general taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the Family and Children's Association to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status with respect to the 2019-2020 assessment roll for a portion of the 2019-2020 school taxes and a portion of the 2019 general taxes and all of the 2020 general taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-08Assemblysubstituted by s329a
2021-06-08Assemblyrules report cal.554
2021-06-08Assemblyreported
2021-06-07Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-06-04Assemblyreference changed to ways and means
2021-06-01Assemblyprint number 4817a
2021-06-01Assemblyamend and recommit to real property taxation
2021-02-08Assemblyreferred to real property taxation

Same As/Similar To

S00329 (Same As) 2021-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.275

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback