NY A04817 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes department of transportation to conduct a statewide survey to determine areas with a high incidence of pedestrian accidents involving senior citizens; requires commissioner to undertake a comprehensive study of mitigating dangers to senior citizens in any and all areas in which the survey indicates the need to take action; requires commissioner to report recommendations and findings to the legislature and the governor on or before April 1, 2018.
Title
Authorizes department of transportation to conduct a statewide survey to determine areas with a high incidence of pedestrian accidents involving senior citizens; requires commissioner to undertake a comprehensive study of mitigating dangers to senior citizens in any and all areas in which the survey indicates the need to take action; requires commissioner to report recommendations and findings to the legislature and the governor on or before April 1, 2018.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2015-02-06 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S00230 (Same As) 2016-01-20 - PRINT NUMBER 230A